Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Airports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137 /CH0803
Title
Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0717 (SB0850/CH0718)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0320)
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1759
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 (HB1231)
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421
Title
Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Employment Under Procurement Contracts - Study
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 /CH0718 (HB0744/CH0717)
Title
Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0137 /CH0803 Transportation - Aviation - Nonairport Taxicab Operators at BWI Delegate McConkey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Economic Matters
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0717 (SB0850/CH0718) Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0320) Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1759 Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 (HB1231) Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Employment Under Procurement Contracts - Study Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 /CH0718 (HB0744/CH0717) Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 718
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM