Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Airports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB0148)
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0184)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619 /CH0276
Title
Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620 /CH0278
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0062)
Title
Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1574
Title
State Personnel and Pensions - Thurgood Marshall Baltimore-Washington International Airport Retirees - Health Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB1410)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 (HB0310)
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1027
Title
Department of Transportation - Heads of Business Units - Appointment and Senate Confirmation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 (SB0148) Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0310 (SB0184) University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Delegate Hill 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0619 /CH0276 Environment – Use of Fire–Fighting Foam and PFAS Chemicals Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 276
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0620 /CH0278 Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations Delegate Love 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 278
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB1410 (SB0062) Labor and Employment – Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1574 State Personnel and Pensions - Thurgood Marshall Baltimore-Washington International Airport Retirees - Health Benefits Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0062 (HB1410) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0184 (HB0310) University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1027 Department of Transportation - Heads of Business Units - Appointment and Senate Confirmation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:02 PM