Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Airports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 (SB0651)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 (SB0107)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1012
Title
Labor and Employment – Reinstatement of Employment – Employees at Baltimore–Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport (BWI–Thurgood Marshall Workers’ Right to Reinstatement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0849)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199 (SB0813)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 (SB0725)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB0705)
Title
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0685)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 (HB0085)
Title
Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB1304)
Title
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1247)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1199)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB1180)
Title
Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 (SB0651) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0254 University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0685 (SB0107) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0765 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act) Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1012 Labor and Employment – Reinstatement of Employment – Employees at Baltimore–Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport (BWI–Thurgood Marshall Workers’ Right to Reinstatement Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1180 (SB0849) Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1199 (SB0813) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1247 (SB0725) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1304 (SB0705) State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0107 (HB0685) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0651 (HB0085) Baltimore County - Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Detention and Correctional Officers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0705 (HB1304) State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0725 (HB1247) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 (HB1199) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 (HB1180) Property Tax Credit - Airport Noise Zones - Eligibility Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page