Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alcoholic Beverages Distribution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150 (SB0174)
Title
More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0618 (SB0335/CH0619)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 /CH0624
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Chilled Beer and Chilled Wine MC 4-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries and Farm Breweries MC 18-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 (SB0684)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries, Farm Breweries, and Limited Beer Wholesalers
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701 /CH0125
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010 /CH0317 (SB0801/CH0318)
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 /CH0379 (SB0704)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 (HB0150)
Title
More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 /CH0619 (HB0291/CH0618)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0615)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries, Farm Breweries, and Limited Beer Wholesalers
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704 (HB1080/CH0379)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 /CH0318 (HB1010/CH0317)
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0150 (SB0174) More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0291 /CH0618 (SB0335/CH0619) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0297 /CH0624 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Chilled Beer and Chilled Wine MC 4-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0333 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries and Farm Breweries MC 18-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 (SB0684) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries, Farm Breweries, and Limited Beer Wholesalers Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0701 /CH0125 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1010 /CH0317 (SB0801/CH0318) Brewery Modernization Act of 2019 Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Delegate Miller 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1080 /CH0379 (SB0704) Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0174 (HB0150) More Opportunities for Marylanders Act of 2019 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 /CH0619 (HB0291/CH0618) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0386 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0684 (HB0615) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries, Farm Breweries, and Limited Beer Wholesalers Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission Senator Kramer 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0704 (HB1080/CH0379) Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0801 /CH0318 (HB1010/CH0317) Brewery Modernization Act of 2019 Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM