Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Site Consumption Permit
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 (SB0295)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 (SB0643/CH0573)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 /CH0609
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0380)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DLR License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0349
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900 /CH0359 (SB0911/CH0360)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class MD License
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturers - Direct Transfer Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318 /CH0458 (SB0377)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Place of Worship Restrictions – Exemptions and Waivers
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319 /CH0459
Title
Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1333
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0532
Title
Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0156)
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB1318/CH0458)
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Place of Worship Restrictions – Exemptions and Waivers
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 (HB0829)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DLR License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0573 (HB0786)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Site Consumption Permit St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0156 (SB0295) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0786 (SB0643/CH0573) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0789 /CH0609 Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wineries - Special Event Permits Washington County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0829 (SB0380) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DLR License Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0860 /CH0349 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Town of Kensington MC 15-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 349
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0900 /CH0359 (SB0911/CH0360) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission - Clarifications Delegate Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 359
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1045 Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class L Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Alcoholic Beverages - Class MD License Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturers - Direct Transfer Permit Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 /CH0458 (SB0377) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Place of Worship Restrictions – Exemptions and Waivers Delegate Reilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 458
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1319 /CH0459 Wicomico County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners Delegate Anderton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 459
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1333 Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0118 /CH0532 Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 532
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 (HB0156) Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Sale of Harvested Cover Crops Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0377 (HB1318/CH0458) Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Place of Worship Restrictions – Exemptions and Waivers Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0380 (HB0829) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class DLR License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 /CH0573 (HB0786) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2020 Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0839 Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Permits and Brewery Limits Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:32 PM