Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aliens and Citizenship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317
Title
State Government - E-Verify Program
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 /CH0368
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 (SB0720)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 (SB0715/CH0309)
Title
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871
Title
Education - Dually Enrolled Students - In-State and In-County Tuition
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 /CH0309 (HB0789)
Title
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720 (HB0476)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0211 Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Qualifications Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0317 State Government - E-Verify Program Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 /CH0368 Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0476 (SB0720) Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0739 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Legal Presence and Tuition Rates - Reporting Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0789 (SB0715/CH0309) Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0871 Education - Dually Enrolled Students - In-State and In-County Tuition Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013 Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0715 /CH0309 (HB0789) Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013 Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0720 (HB0476) Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM