Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Aliens and Citizenship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029 (SB0554)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0096 (SB0396)
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003
Title
Criminal Procedure - Individual With Immigration Detainer (Maryland Law Enforcement and Public Safety Trust Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050
Title
State Occupational or Professional Licenses - Issuance to Undocumented Immigrants - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB0315/CH0096)
Title
Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB0029)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 (SB0554) Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0169 Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0315 /CH0096 (SB0396) Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Judiciary
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1003 Criminal Procedure - Individual With Immigration Detainer (Maryland Law Enforcement and Public Safety Trust Act) Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1050 State Occupational or Professional Licenses - Issuance to Undocumented Immigrants - Prohibited Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
SB0396 (HB0315/CH0096) Equity Court Jurisdiction - Immigrant Children - Custody or Guardianship Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB0029) Maryland Law Enforcement Trust Act Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page