Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0092
Title
Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before Release
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 /CH0093
Title
Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 (SB0393)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0440)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0467 /CH0118
Title
Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit Duration
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0070 (SB0629/CH0069)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and Consumption
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0927)
Title
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - Repeal
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1517 (SB1036)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Allegany County - Cumberland City Market
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0449)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0440 (HB0463)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 /CH0069 (HB0816/CH0070)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 /CH0580
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB1362)
Title
Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1517)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Allegany County - Cumberland City Market
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0254 /CH0092 Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before Release Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 /CH0093 Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Appropriations
2/05/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 (SB0393) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0463 (SB0440) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0467 /CH0118 Allegany County - Roadside Solicitation of Money or Donations - Permit Duration Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 /CH0070 (SB0629/CH0069) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and Consumption Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1362 (SB0927) Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - Repeal Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1366 Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1517 (SB1036) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Allegany County - Cumberland City Market Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0393 (HB0449) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0440 (HB0463) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0629 /CH0069 (HB0816/CH0070) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Video Lottery Facility Sales and Consumption Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 /CH0580 Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB1362) Allegany County - Board of Education - Ex Officio Member - Repeal Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 (HB1517) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Allegany County - Cumberland City Market Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM