Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 (SB0383/CH0295)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 (SB0472/CH0506)
Title
Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0473/CH0507)
Title
Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516 (SB0531)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689 (SB0599)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444 (SB1037)
Title
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1445 (SB1023)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1493 /CH0253 (SB1074)
Title
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on Duty
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 /CH0295 (HB0343)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 /CH0506 (HB0406)
Title
Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0507 (HB0432)
Title
Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0516)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 (HB0689)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023 (HB1445)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB1444)
Title
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1074 (HB1493/CH0253)
Title
Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on Duty
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0343 (SB0383/CH0295) Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0406 (SB0472/CH0506) Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0432 (SB0473/CH0507) Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0516 (SB0531) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0689 (SB0599) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB1444 (SB1037) Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1445 (SB1023) Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional Officers Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1493 /CH0253 (SB1074) Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on Duty Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands President 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 /CH0295 (HB0343) Allegany County and Garrett County - Boards of Education - Removal of Ex Officio Member Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 /CH0506 (HB0406) Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0507 (HB0432) Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0516) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Friends Aware Facility Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 (HB0689) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 (HB1445) Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional Officers Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1037 (HB1444) Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SB1074 (HB1493/CH0253) Allegany County - Deputy Sheriffs - Meals on Duty Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM