Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 /CH0306 (SB0461/CH0305)
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0167 (SB0486/CH0168)
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 /CH0165 (SB0644/CH0166)
Title
Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 (SB0604)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Western Maryland Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0717)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Camp Potomac
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067 (SB0716)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Allegany County – Frostburg Museum Relocation Project
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068 /CH0163 (SB0645/CH0164)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0959)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0305 (HB0287/CH0306)
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 /CH0168 (HB0720/CH0167)
Title
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0724)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 /CH0166 (HB0722/CH0165)
Title
Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0645 /CH0164 (HB1068/CH0163)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 (HB1067)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0717 (HB0911)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Camp Potomac
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB1122)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0287 /CH0306 (SB0461/CH0305) Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0720 /CH0167 (SB0486/CH0168) Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0722 /CH0165 (SB0644/CH0166) Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0724 (SB0604) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Western Maryland Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0717) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Camp Potomac Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1067 (SB0716) Creation of a State Debt – Allegany County – Frostburg Museum Relocation Project Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1068 /CH0163 (SB0645/CH0164) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1122 (SB0959) Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0461 /CH0305 (HB0287/CH0306) Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0486 /CH0168 (HB0720/CH0167) Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0604 (HB0724) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 /CH0166 (HB0722/CH0165) Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0645 /CH0164 (HB1068/CH0163) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0716 (HB1067) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0717 (HB0911) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Camp Potomac Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0959 (HB1122) Natural Resources - Hunting - Black Bears Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM