Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 /CH0713 (SB0943/CH0714)
Title
Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution Process
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 (SB0670)
Title
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0676)
Title
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 /CH0714 (HB0456/CH0713)
Title
Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution Process
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0456 /CH0713 (SB0943/CH0714) Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution Process Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 713
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0676 (SB0670) Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0670 (HB0676) Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0943 /CH0714 (HB0456/CH0713) Children With Disabilities and Child Care Providers - Dispute Resolution Process Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM