Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347)
Title
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Prince George's County - Landlord-Tenant Cases - Alternative Dispute Resolution Program PG 409-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158 (SB1209)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346)
Title
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347) Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0256 Prince George's County - Landlord-Tenant Cases - Alternative Dispute Resolution Program PG 409-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1158 (SB1209) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346) Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM