Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0454)
Title
Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666 (SB0280)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Metro Transit Police Complaints Board
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858
Title
Higher Education - Active Duty Law Enforcement Officers - Tuition Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 (HB0666)
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 (HB0052)
Title
Real Property – Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0052 (SB0454) Real Property - Eviction Actions - Alterations in Actions for Repossession Delegate Wells 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0522 Public Schools - School Resource Officers and School Security Employees - Revisions Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0666 (SB0280) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Metro Transit Police Complaints Board Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0858 Higher Education - Active Duty Law Enforcement Officers - Tuition Exemption Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0280 (HB0666) Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Metro Transit Police – Quotas and Police Complaints Board Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0454 (HB0052) Real Property – Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/30/2021 12:09 PM
Click to return on the top page