Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alternative Energy Sources

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 (SB0373)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 (SB0154)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Energy
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656
Title
Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 /CH0347 (SB0481)
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096
Title
Agriculture - Weight and Measure Requirements - Exemption for Biodiesel Purchasing Cooperative
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0636)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Energy
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353 /CH0161
Title
Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - New Interconnection Agreement
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 (HB0377)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0346
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB1087/CH0347)
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Combustion Source
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899
Title
Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0938
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0377 (SB0373) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015) Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0378 Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0636 (SB0154) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Energy Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 /CH0347 (SB0481) Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Economic Matters
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 Agriculture - Weight and Measure Requirements - Exemption for Biodiesel Purchasing Cooperative Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 (HB0636) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal Energy Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0353 /CH0161 Electric Companies - Installation of Solar Electric Generating Facility - New Interconnection Agreement Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0373 (HB0377) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 /CH0346 Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Finance
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 (HB1087/CH0347) Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0760 Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Combustion Source Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0762 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0899 Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0938 Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM