Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 (SB0440/CH0166)
Title
Somerset County - Service Award Program for Emergency Medical Services and Fire and Rescue Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0440 /CH0166 (HB0378)
Title
Somerset County - Service Award Program for Emergency Medical Services and Fire and Rescue Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0378 (SB0440/CH0166) Somerset County - Service Award Program for Emergency Medical Services and Fire and Rescue Personnel Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Glassman 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0440 /CH0166 (HB0378) Somerset County - Service Award Program for Emergency Medical Services and Fire and Rescue Personnel Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM