Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0412 (SB0605/CH0411)
Title
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0576 (SB0716/CH0575)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838
Title
Civil Immunity - Emergency Care for Drug Overdose - Protocols
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 /CH0071 (SB0516/CH0070)
Title
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376 (SB1121)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Air Ambulance Transport Services
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Baltimore City - Registration of Volunteer Rescue Squads
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0070 (HB0868/CH0071)
Title
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 /CH0411 (HB0232/CH0412)
Title
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0575 (HB0246/CH0576)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1121 (HB1376)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Air Ambulance Transport Services
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0232 /CH0412 (SB0605/CH0411) Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0246 /CH0576 (SB0716/CH0575) Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0838 Civil Immunity - Emergency Care for Drug Overdose - Protocols Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 /CH0071 (SB0516/CH0070) Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1376 (SB1121) Health Insurance - Coverage of Air Ambulance Transport Services Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 Baltimore City - Registration of Volunteer Rescue Squads Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 /CH0070 (HB0868/CH0071) Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 /CH0411 (HB0232/CH0412) Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 /CH0575 (HB0246/CH0576) Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1121 (HB1376) Health Insurance - Coverage of Air Ambulance Transport Services Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM