Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821 (SB1135)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Hatzalah of Baltimore
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1714
Title
Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker Lights
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682 /CH0605
Title
Emergency Medical Services Providers – Coverage and Reimbursement of Services – Reports and Plan
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1135 (HB0821)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Hatzalah of Baltimore
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0821 (SB1135) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Hatzalah of Baltimore Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
HB1714 Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker Lights Delegate Mosby 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0682 /CH0605 Emergency Medical Services Providers – Coverage and Reimbursement of Services – Reports and Plan Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1135 (HB0821) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Hatzalah of Baltimore Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM