Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 (SB0319)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486
Title
Corporal William Kyle Ferrell Emergency Vehicle Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 (SB1008)
Title
Public Safety - Criminal History Records Check - Fire Departments, Rescue Squads, and Ambulance Services
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0688
Title
Use of State or Local Highways - Prohibition or Restriction by Local Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 (SB0777)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters and Emergency Medical Services Providers - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1417
Title
Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543 (SB0912)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1648 (SB1064)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 (HB0130)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330
Title
Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 (HB0779)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters and Emergency Medical Services Providers - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB1543)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1008 (HB0586)
Title
Public Safety - Criminal History Records Check - Fire Departments, Rescue Squads, and Ambulance Services
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064 (HB1648)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 (SB0319) Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 Corporal William Kyle Ferrell Emergency Vehicle Safety Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0586 (SB1008) Public Safety - Criminal History Records Check - Fire Departments, Rescue Squads, and Ambulance Services Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0688 Use of State or Local Highways - Prohibition or Restriction by Local Authority Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0779 (SB0777) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters and Emergency Medical Services Providers - Reimbursement Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1417 Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund and Task Force to Study the Dialysis Patient Transportation Fund Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1543 (SB0912) Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1648 (SB1064) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0319 (HB0130) Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 Civil Actions - Defenses - Fireman's Rule Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0777 (HB0779) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Emergency Service Transporters and Emergency Medical Services Providers - Reimbursement Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 (HB1543) Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1008 (HB0586) Public Safety - Criminal History Records Check - Fire Departments, Rescue Squads, and Ambulance Services Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1064 (HB1648) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
SJ0005 Congressional Action - Surprise Billing - Air Ambulance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/15/2020 8:59 PM