Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Amusement Parks and Carnivals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0364 /CH0107
Title
Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0006 (HB0069/CH0007)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0364 /CH0107 Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law) Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0006 (HB0069/CH0007) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM