Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Animal Shelters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835 (SB0941)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Baltimore County Animal Services
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980 (SB0700)
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1662 /CH0237
Title
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0980)
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB0835)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Baltimore County Animal Services
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0565 Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0835 (SB0941) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Baltimore County Animal Services Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0980 (SB0700) Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1662 /CH0237 Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB0980) Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Establishing a Shelter Animal Refuge Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 (HB0835) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Baltimore County Animal Services Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM