Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Animal Shelters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0159)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563 (SB0338)
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0281)
Title
Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 (HB0563)
Title
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0281 (SB0159) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0381 Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0563 (SB0338) Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021) Delegate Long 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0159 (HB0281) Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0338 (HB0563) Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 12:31 PM
Click to return on the top page