Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Annapolis

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544 /CH0241 (SB0288/CH0242)
Title
City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 /CH0338 (SB0503/CH0339)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class MD License
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 /CH0242 (HB0544/CH0241)
Title
City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 /CH0339 (HB0844/CH0338)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0544 /CH0241 (SB0288/CH0242) City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 241
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0844 /CH0338 (SB0503/CH0339) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 338
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1046 Alcoholic Beverages - Class MD License Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 /CH0242 (HB0544/CH0241) City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0503 /CH0339 (HB0844/CH0338) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:57 PM