Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Annotated Code of Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 /CH0398
Title
Annotated Code of Maryland - Captions and Catchlines - Interpretation
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0611)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0414
Title
Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943 /CH0141 (SB0776)
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1188 /CH0302
Title
Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257
Title
Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222 /CH0021
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 /CH0022
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493
Title
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 (HB0162)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0776 (HB0943/CH0141)
Title
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0084 /CH0398 Annotated Code of Maryland - Captions and Catchlines - Interpretation Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0162 (SB0611) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 /CH0414 Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to Magistrate Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 /CH0141 (SB0776) Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB1038 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1188 /CH0302 Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General Services Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 Orphans' Court - Change of Name to Probate Court Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0222 /CH0021 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 /CH0022 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0611 (HB0162) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0776 (HB0943/CH0141) Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Restructuring President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM