Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Annotated Code of Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103 /CH0205
Title
Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 /CH0105
Title
Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 (SB0082/CH0214)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 /CH0338 (SB0587/CH0337)
Title
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506 /CH0633 (SB0700/CH0634)
Title
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1595 /CH0847 (SB1127/CH0848)
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Somerset County - Code of Public Local Laws - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0631
Title
Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0082 /CH0214 (HB0180)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 /CH0055
Title
Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 /CH0061
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0494 /CH0062
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 /CH0337 (HB1094/CH0338)
Title
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 /CH0634 (HB1506/CH0633)
Title
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994
Title
School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020
Title
Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1127 /CH0848 (HB1595/CH0847)
Title
Baltimore City Community College - Realignment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0103 /CH0205 Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0134 /CH0105 Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community Development Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0161 Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and Restructuring Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0180 (SB0082/CH0214) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0247 Commissioner of Financial Regulation and State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Reorganization and Miscellaneous Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0536 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1094 /CH0338 (SB0587/CH0337) Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Ways and Means
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1506 /CH0633 (SB0700/CH0634) State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1595 /CH0847 (SB1127/CH0848) Baltimore City Community College - Realignment Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Appropriations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0039 Somerset County - Code of Public Local Laws - Cross-References and Corrections Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/12/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 /CH0631 Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - Nonprofits Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0082 /CH0214 (HB0180) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 /CH0055 Code Revision - Maryland Vehicle Law - Penalties President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 /CH0061 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0494 /CH0062 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 /CH0337 (HB1094/CH0338) Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance Structure Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 /CH0634 (HB1506/CH0633) State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - Renaming Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Finance
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 School Overcrowding Reduction Act of 2017 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1020 Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017 Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1127 /CH0848 (HB1595/CH0847) Baltimore City Community College - Realignment Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM