Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Annotated Code of Maryland

Legislation
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060 /CH0091
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0040 (SB0201)
Title
University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 /CH0094
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 /CH0673
Title
Montgomery County - Department of Liquor Control - Renaming MC 2-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1041
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 (SB0595)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 /CH0038 (SB0594/CH0039)
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 (HB0319/CH0040)
Title
University of Maryland University College - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0196
Title
Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses
Sponsor
President
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 /CH0007
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 /CH0008
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0594 /CH0039 (HB1330/CH0038)
Title
State Law Library - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 (HB1329)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0060 /CH0091 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Renaming Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0319 /CH0040 (SB0201) University of Maryland University College - Renaming Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0370 /CH0094 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Police Force - Repeal Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0408 Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 /CH0673 Montgomery County - Department of Liquor Control - Renaming MC 2-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1041 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Delegate Miller 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1329 (SB0595) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 /CH0038 (SB0594/CH0039) State Law Library - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0201 (HB0319/CH0040) University of Maryland University College - Renaming Senator Pinsky 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0196 Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 /CH0007 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 7
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0580 /CH0008 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 8
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0594 /CH0039 (HB1330/CH0038) State Law Library - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0595 (HB1329) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission Senator Kramer 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM