Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Annotated Code of Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037 /CH0036 (SB0145/CH0037)
Title
Election Law – Absentee Voting – References in Public Communications and Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 (SB0393)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Renaming and Purpose
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0508
Title
Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 /CH0037 (HB0037/CH0036)
Title
Election Law – Absentee Voting – References in Public Communications and Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 (HB0474)
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0037 /CH0036 (SB0145/CH0037) Election Law – Absentee Voting – References in Public Communications and Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36
Ways and Means
1/16/2020 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0428 Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0474 (SB0393) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 State Finance and Procurement – Procedures and Pricing and Selection Committee for Preferred Providers Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0694 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Renaming and Purpose Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1264 Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0049 /CH0508 Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 508
Finance
1/09/2020 - 1:45 PM
Appropriations
SB0145 /CH0037 (HB0037/CH0036) Election Law – Absentee Voting – References in Public Communications and Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots Senator Hester 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0393 (HB0474) Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1075 Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:21 PM