Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Antitrust Enforcement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Courts - Business and Technology Court
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544 /CH0847 (SB0891/CH0848)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 /CH0848 (HB1544/CH0847)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1071 Courts - Business and Technology Court Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1544 /CH0847 (SB0891/CH0848) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 847
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 /CH0848 (HB1544/CH0847) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Civil Penalty President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 848
Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM