Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128
Title
Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Manager
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Water and Wastewater Charges - Billing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759
Title
Home Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 /CH0175 (SB0182/CH0174)
Title
Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide Alarms
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0298
Title
Prince George's County - Dissemination of Voter Information Material - Multifamily Residential Structures PG 408-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 (SB0827)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Restoration Gardens 2
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1472
Title
Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 /CH0174 (HB0849/CH0175)
Title
Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide Alarms
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0241 /CH0543
Title
Real Property - Senior Apartment Facilities - Conversion
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Glenarden Apartments Redevelopment Project
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB1308)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Restoration Gardens 2
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Manager Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 Landlord and Tenant - Water and Wastewater Charges - Billing Systems Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0759 Home Act of 2016 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0849 /CH0175 (SB0182/CH0174) Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide Alarms Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1127 /CH0298 Prince George's County - Dissemination of Voter Information Material - Multifamily Residential Structures PG 408-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 (SB0827) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Restoration Gardens 2 Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB1472 Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016 Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0182 /CH0174 (HB0849/CH0175) Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide Alarms Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0241 /CH0543 Real Property - Senior Apartment Facilities - Conversion Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Glenarden Apartments Redevelopment Project Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB1308) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Restoration Gardens 2 Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM