Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415
Title
Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Douglas Memorial Community Church Village Apartments
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687
Title
Senior Apartment Housing Facilities - Baltimore City - Security Guard Services
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491 /CH0532
Title
Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1701 (SB1168)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Baltimore City – J. Van Story Branch Apartment Building
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397
Title
Public Utilities - Apartment Houses and Commercial Buildings - Service Charges
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1168 (HB1701)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - J. Van Story Branch Apartment Building
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0415 Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0590 Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Douglas Memorial Community Church Village Apartments Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0687 Senior Apartment Housing Facilities - Baltimore City - Security Guard Services Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1491 /CH0532 Public Service Commission – Repeal of Master Metering Authorization and Study on Energy Allocation Systems and Submetering Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1701 (SB1168) Creation of a State Debt – Baltimore City – J. Van Story Branch Apartment Building Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
SB0397 Public Utilities - Apartment Houses and Commercial Buildings - Service Charges Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1168 (HB1701) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - J. Van Story Branch Apartment Building Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM