Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 (SB0812)
Title
Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919
Title
Baltimore City – Senior Apartment Housing Facilities – Security Services
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 /CH0187 (SB0892)
Title
Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB0451)
Title
Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0264 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0451 (SB0812) Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0919 Baltimore City – Senior Apartment Housing Facilities – Security Services Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1135 /CH0187 (SB0892) Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 (HB0451) Fair Housing Opportunities Act of 2019 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187) Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM