Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988
Title
Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276
Title
County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1540 (SB1067)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1067 (HB1540)
Title
Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0408 Public Utilities - Gas Service Regulator Safety (Flower Branch Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB0744 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0988 Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1276 County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1540 (SB1067) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1067 (HB1540) Environment - Mold Inspections - Standards, Reporting, and Penalties Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 8:21 PM