Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 (SB0967)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Real Property – Sale of Apartment Facilities – Rights of Qualified Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061 (SB0832)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283
Title
Real Property – Residential Leases – Rent Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1061)
Title
Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 (HB0050)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 (SB0967) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0515 Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0866 Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
HB0952 Real Property – Sale of Apartment Facilities – Rights of Qualified Organizations Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1061 (SB0832) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1283 Real Property – Residential Leases – Rent Restrictions Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0832 (HB1061) Southern Maryland - Dwelling Registration and Inspection - Fees and Fines Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0931 Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report - Sunset Extension and Report Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0967 (HB0050) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act of 2021) Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:19 PM
Click to return on the top page