Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appeals -see also- Judicial Review

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0103
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0251
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal Rights
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 /CH0586 (SB0310/CH0587)
Title
Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 (SB0541/CH0596)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of Municipal and Zoning Appeals - Appeals Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510
Title
Property Tax - Assessments and Valuations of Real Property - Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 (SB0652)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Time Period for Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180 (SB0895)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1394 /CH0529
Title
Property Tax - Reassessment After Appeal
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397
Title
Property Tax Appeals - Method of Calculating Assessment - Provision to Taxpayers
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402 /CH0530
Title
Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline and Notice
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0310 /CH0587 (HB0390/CH0586)
Title
Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 /CH0544
Title
Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney Representation
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501
Title
Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0596 (HB0447)
Title
Baltimore City - Board of Municipal and Zoning Appeals - Appeals Authority
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0871)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1180)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066
Title
Criminal Procedure - Modification of Sentences
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1180
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 /CH0103 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0139 /CH0251 Unemployment Insurance - Employer Determinations - Process and Appeal Rights Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0390 /CH0586 (SB0310/CH0587) Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0447 (SB0541/CH0596) Baltimore City - Board of Municipal and Zoning Appeals - Appeals Authority Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0510 Property Tax - Assessments and Valuations of Real Property - Appeals Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0871 (SB0652) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Time Period for Eligibility Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1142 Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student Organizations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1180 (SB0895) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1218 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Financial Conditions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1394 /CH0529 Property Tax - Reassessment After Appeal Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 Property Tax Appeals - Method of Calculating Assessment - Provision to Taxpayers Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 /CH0530 Property Tax Appeals - Payment of Refunds - Deadline and Notice Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 Maryland Animal Abuse Registry Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0310 /CH0587 (HB0390/CH0586) Improving the State Procurement Oversight Structure President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 /CH0544 Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney Representation Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 Real Property - Wrongful Detainer Actions - Trial by Jury Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0596 (HB0447) Baltimore City - Board of Municipal and Zoning Appeals - Appeals Authority Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0871) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1180) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1066 Criminal Procedure - Modification of Sentences Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1180 Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM