Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appraisals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0487)
Title
Home Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 /CH0636
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0427)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0397)
Title
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397 (HB1097)
Title
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0427 (HB0796)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0603)
Title
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0603 (SB0487) Home Act of 2013 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0713 /CH0636 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0427) Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0397) Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
SB0397 (HB1097) Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0427 (HB0796) Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0603) Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM