Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appraisals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0568)
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227 /CH0121
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0721)
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 (SB0568) Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 /CH0121 Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver Requirements Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0568 (HB0721) Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM