Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aquaculture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0083
Title
Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 /CH0235 (SB0808)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0709)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0557)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0461
Title
Aquatic Invasive Species - Decontamination of Vessels (State Lakes Invasive Species Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250 (SB0858)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Job Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1287 /CH0307
Title
Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission and Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0760)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB0419)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0287/CH0235)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 (HB1250)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Job Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931
Title
Oysters - Oyster Committees and Harvest Reserve Areas
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0286 /CH0083 Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0287 /CH0235 (SB0808) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0419 (SB0709) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 (SB0557) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0860 /CH0461 Aquatic Invasive Species - Decontamination of Vessels (State Lakes Invasive Species Act of 2015) Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 (SB0858) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Job Training Center Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB1287 /CH0307 Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission and Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 (HB0760) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0709 (HB0419) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - Consideration of User Conflicts Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 (HB0287/CH0235) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 (HB1250) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Job Training Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0931 Oysters - Oyster Committees and Harvest Reserve Areas Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM