Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aquaculture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0101
Title
Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 /CH0027
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Management - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 /CH0381
Title
Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - National Historic Landmarks
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964 /CH0380
Title
Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0120 /CH0101 Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0924 /CH0027 Natural Resources - Oyster Management - Prohibited Actions Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1200 /CH0381 Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1284 Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases - National Historic Landmarks Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0964 /CH0380 Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM