Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Aquaculture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0342)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0950)
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306 (SB0629)
Title
Natural Resources - SAV Protection Zones and Hydraulic Clam Dredges (Aquatic Habitat Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1434
Title
Aquaculture Leases – Marking Requirements and Use of Lease – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438
Title
Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 /CH0528
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 (HB0210)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 (HB1306)
Title
Natural Resources - SAV Protection Zones and Hydraulic Clam Dredges (Aquatic Habitat Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711
Title
Aquaculture – Water Column Leases – Conflict Resolution
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0950 (HB1059)
Title
Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979
Title
Income Tax Credit - Value-Added Processing Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0003 (HJ0003)
Title
Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0210 (SB0342) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1059 (SB0950) Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1306 (SB0629) Natural Resources - SAV Protection Zones and Hydraulic Clam Dredges (Aquatic Habitat Protection Act) Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1434 Aquaculture Leases – Marking Requirements and Use of Lease – Alterations Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0003 (SJ0003) Natural Resources - Fishing - Wild-Caught Blue Catfish Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0114 /CH0528 Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0342 (HB0210) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0629 (HB1306) Natural Resources - SAV Protection Zones and Hydraulic Clam Dredges (Aquatic Habitat Protection Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0711 Aquaculture – Water Column Leases – Conflict Resolution Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0950 (HB1059) Aquaculture Lease Applications - Notice, Protests, and Meetings - Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 Income Tax Credit - Value-Added Processing Expenses Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SJ0003 (HJ0003) Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:21 PM