Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 (SB0749)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0789)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181 /CH0370 (SB1066/CH0369)
Title
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 (SB0989)
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB0824)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 (HB0259)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257)
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 (HB0490)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB1009)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1292)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 (HB1224)
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 /CH0369 (HB1181/CH0370)
Title
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 (SB0293/CH0288) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 (SB0749) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 (SB0789) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1066 Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding Arbitration Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1181 /CH0370 (SB1066/CH0369) Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1224 (SB0989) State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 (SB0824) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Delegate Jones 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 (HB0259) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 /CH0288 (HB0257) Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0749 (HB0490) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 (HB1009) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB1292) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0989 (HB1224) State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1066 /CH0369 (HB1181/CH0370) Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM