Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Independent Review Board - Refunds MC/PG 106-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0570)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 (SB0566)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093 (SB0614)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Certificate and Report of Qualified Expert - Objection
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0968)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0829)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 (HB1093)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0993)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0398 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0677 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Independent Review Board - Refunds MC/PG 106-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0829 (SB0570) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0966 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 (SB0566) Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1093 (SB0614) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 Health Care Malpractice - Certificate and Report of Qualified Expert - Objection Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 (HB0968) Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 (HB0829) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0614 (HB1093) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0993) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM