Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140
Title
Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238 /CH0443 (SB0747)
Title
Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 /CH0561
Title
Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 /CH0562
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486 /CH0055 (SB0541)
Title
Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 /CH0379 (SB0704)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 (HB0486/CH0055)
Title
Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587
Title
State Personnel - Employee Organizations and Exclusive Representatives - Dues and Representation
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704 (HB1080/CH0379)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0238/CH0443)
Title
Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0140 Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0238 /CH0443 (SB0747) Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0302 /CH0561 Montgomery County Housing Opportunities Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC 26-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 /CH0562 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 /CH0055 (SB0541) Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 55
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0766 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB1080 /CH0379 (SB0704) Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1251 Baltimore City - Police Department - Collective Bargaining and Arbitration Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 Child Support - Lien Against Monetary Award Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 (HB0486/CH0055) Education - Personnel Matters - Child Sexual Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0587 State Personnel - Employee Organizations and Exclusive Representatives - Dues and Representation Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0704 (HB1080/CH0379) Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0747 (HB0238/CH0443) Education - Removal of County Superintendents - Procedures Senator Lam 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM