Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 (SB0438)
Title
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757 /CH0138
Title
Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Reporting of Architectural Services and Engineering Services Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 (HB0534)
Title
State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0534 (SB0438) State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0757 /CH0138 Procurement - Minority Business Enterprises - Reporting of Architectural Services and Engineering Services Contracts Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2013 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0438 (HB0534) State Procurement - Contracting for Services Outside the United States Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM