Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0045 (SB0077/CH0046)
Title
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0962)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1557 /CH0633 (SB1020/CH0634)
Title
Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0046 (HB0188/CH0045)
Title
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962 (HB0958)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020 /CH0634 (HB1557/CH0633)
Title
Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0188 /CH0045 (SB0077/CH0046) State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0958 (SB0962) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1557 /CH0633 (SB1020/CH0634) Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0077 /CH0046 (HB0188/CH0045) State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - Membership Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0962 (HB0958) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1020 /CH0634 (HB1557/CH0633) Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM