Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0386)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0734)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0138
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0276)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review PG/MC 101-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 (SB0368)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0790
Title
Income Tax - Green Buildings Tax Credit - Multifamily Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 /CH0347 (SB0249/CH0348)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249 /CH0348 (HB0858/CH0347)
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB0338)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0681)
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0058)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 (HB0111)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 /CH0590
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0386) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0111 (SB0734) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB0254 /CH0138 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 138
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0338 (SB0276) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
HB0394 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review PG/MC 101-20 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (126-7)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 (SB0368) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0790 Income Tax - Green Buildings Tax Credit - Multifamily Housing Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 /CH0347 (SB0249/CH0348) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Delegate McComas 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 347
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0890 Maryland Paint Stewardship Program Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1087 Business Occupations and Professions - Architects - Scope of Licensure Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0249 /CH0348 (HB0858/CH0347) Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order Senator Cassilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 348
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0276 (HB0338) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0368 (HB0681) Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0058) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0734 (HB0111) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB0946 Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 /CH0590 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:40 PM