Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 /CH0265
Title
Maryland General Assembly - Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video Streaming
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492 (SB0155)
Title
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261
Title
State Archivist - Process for Evaluating State Designations
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 (HB0215)
Title
Maryland State Song - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB0492)
Title
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0413 /CH0265 Maryland General Assembly - Pilot Program on Closed Captioning for Video Streaming Delegate Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0492 (SB0155) Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1261 State Archivist - Process for Evaluating State Designations Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/09/2016 - 12:30 PM
SB0049 (HB0215) Maryland State Song - Revision Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0155 (HB0492) Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0467 General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM