Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0295)
Title
Transparency Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1093 /CH0516
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0352)
Title
Transparency Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0352 (SB0295) Transparency Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB1093 /CH0516 Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act Delegate Platt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 (HB0352) Transparency Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM