Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arrests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0092
Title
Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before Release
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 /CH0431
Title
Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558
Title
Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 /CH0622 (SB0419)
Title
Civil Actions - Interrogatories or Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear to Show Cause
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597 (SB0418)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0850)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 /CH0146
Title
Business Regulation - Returnable Containers and Returnable Textiles - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 /CH0409
Title
Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360 (SB0243/CH0213)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County Warrant Intercept Program - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 /CH0213 (HB1360)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County Warrant Intercept Program - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0597)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0596/CH0622)
Title
Civil Actions - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069
Title
Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0150 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
HB0254 /CH0092 Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before Release Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 /CH0431 Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0558 Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013 Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 /CH0622 (SB0419) Civil Actions - Interrogatories or Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear to Show Cause Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0597 (SB0418) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 (SB0850) Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 /CH0146 Business Regulation - Returnable Containers and Returnable Textiles - Revisions Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 /CH0409 Invalidation and Destruction of Unexecuted Warrant, Summons, or Other Criminal Process - Failure to Appear Designation Delegate Swain 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 (SB0243/CH0213) Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County Warrant Intercept Program - Extension Delegate George 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0243 /CH0213 (HB1360) Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County Warrant Intercept Program - Extension Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0597) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 (HB0596/CH0622) Civil Actions - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 (HB0627) Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1069 Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM