Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arrests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 /CH0309
Title
Howard County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Authority Ho. Co. 24-17
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0835)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435 (SB0725)
Title
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1435)
Title
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1362)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1343 /CH0309 Howard County - Fire and Explosive Investigator - Authority Ho. Co. 24-17 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1362 (SB0835) Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1435 (SB0725) Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 (HB1435) Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1362) Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM