Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arrests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0011 (SB0452)
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0566)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839 (SB0779)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867 (SB0013)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Urinalyses, Civil Offense Threshold, and Evidence Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342 (SB0971)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0867)
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0760)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627
Title
Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance - Probable Cause
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB0839)
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094)
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971 (HB1342)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0011 (SB0452) Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
1/23/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0760 (SB0566) Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 (SB0779) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0867 (SB0013) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0875 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Urinalyses, Civil Offense Threshold, and Evidence Standards Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Procedures - Use of Force Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 (SB0971) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1371 Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0013 (HB0867) Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0566 (HB0760) Criminal Procedure - Criminal Citations - Reporting Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0627 Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance - Probable Cause Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0779 (HB0839) Division of Parole and Probation - Central Home Detention Unit - Powers Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094) Community Safety and Strengthening Act Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0971 (HB1342) Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Citations in Lieu of Arrest Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM