Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Arrests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195
Title
Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioners - Issuance of Arrest Warrant
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 (SB0592)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrants - Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
District Court Commissioners - Arrest Warrants - Recall and Issuance of a Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0445 (SB0671)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures - Citations
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0456)
Title
Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0688 (SB0028)
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848 (SB0657)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0939)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Expansion of Mental Health Services and Prohibition of School Resource Officers (Police–Free Schools Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 03-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 (HB0688)
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118
Title
Correctional Services - Warrant Apprehension Unit - Transfer
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0502)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 (HB0258)
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 (HB0848)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 (HB0445)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862
Title
Arrest Warrants Issued by District Court Commissioners - Recall by Judge
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1024)
Title
Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0159 Public Safety - Persistent Aerial Surveillance Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0195 Criminal Procedure - District Court Commissioners - Issuance of Arrest Warrant Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0258 (SB0592) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0329 Criminal Procedure - Warrants - Issuance Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0366 District Court Commissioners - Arrest Warrants - Recall and Issuance of a Summons Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0445 (SB0671) Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures - Citations Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0496 Primary and Secondary Education - Mental Health Services - Expansion (Counselors Not Cops Act) Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0502 (SB0456) Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB0688 (SB0028) Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0848 (SB0657) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1024 (SB0939) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1089 Primary and Secondary Education – Expansion of Mental Health Services and Prohibition of School Resource Officers (Police–Free Schools Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1191 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Ho. Co. 03-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0028 (HB0688) Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Sports Official Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0118 Correctional Services - Warrant Apprehension Unit - Transfer Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
Judiciary
SB0456 (HB0502) Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0592 (HB0258) State Child Welfare System - Reporting Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0657 (HB0848) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0671 (HB0445) Criminal Procedure – Charging Procedures – Citations Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0862 Arrest Warrants Issued by District Court Commissioners - Recall by Judge Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1024) Charles County - Citizens Complaint Oversight Board Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page